Accounts and annual returns THE OXFORD SCHOOL OF DRAMA TRUST

Charity number: 1072770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 February 2021 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 February 2021 240 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 05 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window