Financial history THE OXFORD SCHOOL OF DRAMA TRUST

Charity number: 1072770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.01m £1.00m £1.06m £989.22k £1.31m
Total expenditure £952.17k £954.12k £1.04m £1.06m £1.18m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £402.30k £435.78k £477.93k £513.70k £461.74k
Income - Donations and legacies £29.13k £46.02k £103.34k £56.77k £45.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £982.88k £954.21k £951.70k £930.20k £1.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.38k £1.06k £715 £2.25k £2.02k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £952.17k £954.12k £1.04m £1.06m £1.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.64k £5.04k £4.67k £4.87k £5.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0