Accounts and annual returns INDEPENDENCE INITIATIVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1073291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 February 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window