THE FRIENDS OF ST ANDREWS CHURCH BRADENHAM

Charity number: 1073236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required