Governance THE UNITED KINGDOM COMMITTEE FOR UNICEF

Charity number: 1072612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 26 November 1998: Standard registration
  • 24 February 2017: Funds received from 1125250 THE M M B FOUNDATION
  • 01 October 2018: Funds received from 256640 NEW RENASCENCE
  • 03 February 2021: Funds received from 1143457 THE LYCETT HUMANITARIAN TRUST
  • 14 May 2021: Funds received from 271022 THE GUTHRIE ESSAME CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 07 June 2023: Funds received from 1038063 SKCV CHILDREN'S TRUST (UK)
  • 24 January 2024: Funds received from 268645 MRS S L CHAMBERS' CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • UNICEF UK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property