NORTHAMPTON AFRO-CARIBBEAN ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1075816
Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £6.79k £5.41k £5.31k £5.62k £7.38k
Total expenditure £11.08k £13.45k £9.90k £10.48k £9.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A