Trustees EL SHADDAI CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1076768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Linley Chair 07 January 2014
CRIBS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
TRINITY BAPTIST CHURCH BEXLEYHEATH
Received: 3 days late
Anita Kathryn Edgar-Cole Trustee 24 September 2021
None on record
Sanjiv Mohanhlal Shah Trustee 15 September 2019
None on record
David Montgomery Trustee 15 September 2018
None on record
Dr Charles Cottrell Trustee 19 September 2016
None on record
Mary Pamela Care Trustee 07 January 2014
None on record
RUTH BEALING Trustee
None on record