Financial history HOLSTEIN UK

Charity number: 1072998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.57m £10.33m £10.98m £11.24m £11.01m
Total expenditure £9.59m £11.18m £10.50m £10.64m £10.02m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £16.80k £54.14k £26.00k £172.84k
Income - Other trading activities £6.27m £7.54m £8.01m £8.33m £8.37m
Income - Charitable activities £3.18m £2.62m £2.72m £2.69m £2.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £111.49k £152.28k £194.79k £189.07k £143.60k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.68m £4.18m £3.63m £3.35m £2.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £7.00m £0 £7.29m £7.45m
Expenditure - Governance £10.00k £22.00k £68.39k £27.75k £10.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £8.16k £0 £29.91k £45.54k
Expenditure - Other £4.91m £0 £6.87m £0 £0