AFRICA ENTERPRISE TRUST

Charity number: 1075638
Charity reporting is overdue by 419 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 419 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 419 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 14 January 2020 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 30 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 30 July 2017 On time Download