CARE FOR THE CARERS

Charity number: 1074906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Elizabeth Lilja Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
ALAN BOTTERILL Trustee 30 September 2015 None on record
Dr Neil Gareth Churchill OBE Chair 28 December 2020 None on record
Jake Jay Trustee 04 February 2020 None on record
Christopher John Raper Trustee 28 September 2016 None on record
Polly Angharad Evans Trustee 24 October 2019 None on record