Accounts and annual returns WHITE CLOSE SLAPTON TRUST

Charity number: 1075126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 07 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 29 February 2020 214 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required