Financial history WHITE CLOSE SLAPTON TRUST

Charity number: 1075126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £1.65k £3.34k
Total expenditure £178 £250 £178 £279 £2.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A