PEMBROKESHIRE SIBLING GROUP

Charity number: 1076083
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 February 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 February 2020 27 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 June 2016 On time Download