PEMBROKESHIRE SIBLING GROUP

Charity number: 1076083
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £31.79k £7.64k £14.18k £35.37k £35.37k
Total expenditure £18.34k £25.54k £8.24k £11.60k £11.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A