Financial history ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY (BATH BRANCH)

Charity number: 1074609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.67k £10.44k £9.53k £9.92k £2.13k
Total expenditure £8.32k £10.34k £10.01k £9.58k £1.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A