Financial history THE NORTHAMPTON THEATRES TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1075741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 28/03/2021
Total gross income £9.83m £10.80m £10.66m £10.06m £5.13m
Total expenditure £9.78m £11.54m £11.67m £11.18m £4.32m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.54m £1.20m £1.18m £1.32m £4.85m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.32m £1.62m £1.31m £1.50m £4.99m
Income - Other trading activities £965.60k £958.50k £1.01m £1.02m £4.16k
Income - Charitable activities £7.35m £8.01m £8.02m £7.21m £82.90k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £191.08k £207.88k £324.96k £344.88k £54.62k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.79m £10.74m £10.63m £10.25m £3.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £948.47k £751.70k £988.31k £928.43k £334.42k
Expenditure - Governance £109.75k £100.45k £97.92k £106.75k £91.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £41.00k £51.00k £50.00k £0 £0