Financial history THE LERI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1075107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/03/2017 02/03/2018 02/03/2019 02/03/2020 02/03/2021
Total gross income £16.10m £263.69k £255.77k £255.77k £305.40k
Total expenditure £8.52m £798.74k £888.83k £888.83k £817.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £15.84m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £127.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £129.59k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.52m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £93.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £8.42m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A