Financial history MENITHWOOD MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1075322
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £332 £242 £873 £369 £713
Total expenditure £351 £337 £357 £375 £535
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A