ANGOLAN AFRICAN CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1085681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £45 £21 £35 £5 £10
Total expenditure £39 £16 £25 £0 £6
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A