PRAXIS COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1078945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Raphael Perret Trustee 19 May 2016 None on record
Constance Jean Cullen Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
Thomas John BRAND Trustee 07 November 2019 None on record
Jumana Rahman Trustee 30 July 2015 None on record
BARBARA MAUREEN ROCHE Chair 31 January 2013 None on record
Shashi Ruby Giblin Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
DYLAN TOBY TRIONFI MATTHEWS Trustee 25 January 2018
THE ROBERT KEMBLE CHRISTIAN INSTITUTE Received: On time
Martin Campos Trustee 18 November 2017 None on record
Pasha Coupet Michaelsen Trustee 30 January 2014 None on record
Kemi Ogunlana Trustee 12 November 2020 None on record