C T AND H E ROBINSON CHARITABLE TRUST FOR THE CARIB AND LOKONO ARAWAK INDIANS

Charity number: 1075823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £18.30k £18.46k £19.55k £19.18k £15.37k
Total expenditure £12.81k £11.46k £29.57k £23.28k £26.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A