Financial history THE KING'S SCHOOL, GLOUCESTER

Charity number: 1080641
Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £7.56m £8.13m £8.13m £9.38m £10.66m
Total expenditure £7.29m £8.16m £8.16m £9.25m £10.51m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.22k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.84k £94.00k £94.00k £18.05k £25.31k
Income - Other trading activities £91.13k £35.57k £62.80k £17.52k £52.39k
Income - Charitable activities £7.44m £7.97m £7.97m £8.85m £10.53m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £385 £3.85k £3.85k £3.00k £8.87k
Income - Other £24.23k £27.23k £0 £488.19k £44.40k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.21m £8.14m £8.05m £9.12m £10.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.49k £17.60k £115.43k £132.85k £138.48k
Expenditure - Governance £49.23k £64.54k £48.90k £101.14k £75.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £74.11k £0 £0 £0 £0