STAR (STUDENT ACTION FOR REFUGEES)

Charity number: 1079042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £373.03k £359.32k £199.38k £216.14k £225.16k
Total expenditure £292.83k £303.75k £282.13k £256.99k £257.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A