YOUTHSCAPE

Charity number: 1081754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alice Emily Smith Trustee 28 June 2021 None on record
Dr Nenadi Adamu Trustee 21 October 2017 None on record
Andrew James Course Trustee 29 March 2021 None on record
Matt Summerfield Rev Chair 17 May 2019 None on record
Rev Andrew Neil Gardner Trustee 06 October 2016 None on record
Rev TIMOTHY MICHAEL LOMAX Trustee 30 August 2018 None on record