MIDLANDS ETHNIC ALBANIAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1079774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 26 May 2020 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 02 September 2019 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 26 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2015 26 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required