Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST. JAMES'S CHURCH, MUSWELL HILL

Charity number: 1075986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 15 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 15 March 2022 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 12 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 12 March 2020 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 14 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required