THE FURNEUX PELHAM CHURCH RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 1076766
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £1.81k £1.20k £1.86k £1.77k £30.11k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £30.03k £2.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A