Accounts and annual returns BLUE ELEPHANT THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1077161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window