ST. MARY DE CASTRO CHALLENGE 900 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1080547
Charity reporting is overdue by 225 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £7.52k £8.65k £6.68k £6.14k £4.96k
Total expenditure £259 £32.65k £3.80k £3.95k £4.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A