Trustees THE PRIORY OF ENGLAND AND THE ISLANDS OF THE MOST VENERABLE ORDER OF THE HOSPITAL OF ST. JOHN OF JERUSALEM
Charity number: 1077265

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart James Shilson LVO DL | Chair | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rear Admiral Simon Paul Williams CB CVO | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Paul Rhys Williams | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Tanya Coff | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Ashley Sweetland MBE CStJ | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Rosalind Anita Jane Smith | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ann Cable MBE | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.