LONDON MANDARIN NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1077219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.48k £4.01k £4.58k £6.01k £6.93k
Total expenditure £13.33k £6.45k £4.71k £2.89k £7.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A