Accounts and annual returns STAMFORD KIWANIS COMMUNITY CHEST TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1077288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 August 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 August 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 February 2020 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required