Financial history STAMFORD KIWANIS COMMUNITY CHEST TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1077288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £19.56k £23.82k £2.70k £36.59k £32.40k
Total expenditure £14.45k £32.22k £19.69k £18.28k £24.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A