Financial history HIS PRESENCE TEMPLE MINISTRY

Charity number: 1077396
Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £33.43k £29.96k £38.18k £28.00k £32.53k
Total expenditure £34.55k £37.07k £31.60k £32.00k £37.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A