Financial history EDEN'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1078566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £42.75k £69.64k £230.68k £84.03k £50.50k
Total expenditure £62.05k £60.38k £96.49k £58.90k £62.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.92k £8.92k £10.79k £47.89k £7.92k