DEVELOPING HEALTH AND INDEPENDENCE

Charity number: 1078154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katharine Hegarty Trustee 17 May 2016 None on record
Tim Marvell Trustee 20 November 2018 None on record
Linda Candy Trustee 10 September 2019
CHIPPENHAM BOROUGH LANDS CHARITY Received: On time
David Ollendorff Trustee 17 May 2016 None on record
SARAH ANN DAVIES Chair 25 June 2013
THE DOROTHY KERIN TRUST
BRADFORD ON AVON CHORAL SOCIETY Received: On time
Myriam Kniveton Trustee 09 March 2021 None on record
Alison Millar Trustee 14 May 2019 None on record
Robert Goodman Trustee 10 September 2019 None on record
Christopher Oliver Trustee 20 November 2018 None on record