BOSCASTLE COMMUNITY AND RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1079091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £4.29k £5.31k £5.17k £5.36k £6.04k
Total expenditure £3.91k £3.94k £5.58k £4.90k £4.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A