Financial history WEST MERCIA WOMEN'S AID

Charity number: 1078496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.43m £1.55m £1.89m £2.24m £2.57m
Total expenditure £1.51m £1.58m £1.89m £2.12m £2.40m
Income from government contracts £1.12m £1.21m £1.27m £1.57m £1.69m
Income from government grants N/A £10.97k £158.90k £75.19k £129.87k
Income - Donations and legacies £13.52k £17.69k £32.59k £66.27k £150.90k
Income - Other trading activities £75 £2.63k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.41m £1.53m £1.85m £2.18m £2.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £394 £1.20k £1.43k £356 £216
Income - Other £105 £0 £3.40k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.51m £1.56m £1.89m £2.12m £2.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £297 £18.64k £1.30k £226 £225
Expenditure - Governance £12.08k £13.77k £0 £14.05k £11.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0