RAGALLA AID PROJECT

Charity number: 1079120
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 06 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 29 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 18 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 18 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)