RAGALLA AID PROJECT

Charity number: 1079120
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £43.51k £44.01k £52.70k £49.43k £50.91k
Total expenditure £56.51k £58.98k £42.85k £36.61k £74.72k