GUINEA-BISSAU BRITISH TRUST FOR DEVELOPMENT PROMOTION AND SUPPORT(GBXO/UK-TRUST)

Charity number: 1078487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/03/2016 30/03/2017 30/03/2018 30/03/2019 30/03/2020
Total gross income £6.03k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.01k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A