DUDLEY LODGE

Charity number: 1078207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.98m £3.15m £3.65m £3.52m £3.93m
Total expenditure £2.73m £2.98m £3.66m £3.51m £3.55m
Income from government contracts £0 £3.03m £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £43.97k £5.40k £400 £6.80k £2.82k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.93m £3.14m £3.65m £3.51m £3.92m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.24k £3.37k £2.74k £3.82k £5.67k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £40.76k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.73m £2.97m £3.65m £3.50m £3.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £2.99k £13.61k £6.31k £6.15k
Expenditure - Governance £13.67k £7.89k £9.33k £9.50k £9.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0