Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL, DIGSWELL

Charity number: 1077943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 28/02/2020 27/02/2021
Total gross income £7.29k £11.41k £17.03k £12.66k £8.76k
Total expenditure £5.71k £6.11k £18.63k £13.96k £12.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A