WOOD STREET MISSION

Charity number: 1078337
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £445.91k £524.06k £437.51k £826.46k £619.55k
Total expenditure £409.35k £466.06k £521.01k £664.08k £767.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £481.32k N/A £788.10k £582.78k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £1.39k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £37.96k N/A £32.83k £35.39k
Income - Other N/A £4.78k N/A £5.53k £0
Income - Legacies N/A £83.98k N/A £333.70k £95.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £411.83k N/A £653.55k £767.44k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £54.23k N/A £10.53k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £47.09k N/A £67.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £9.99k N/A £10.53k £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0