Accounts and annual returns FRADDON MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1078323
Charity reporting is overdue by 1340 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 609 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 609 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 975 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 975 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1340 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1340 days
Annual return 05 April 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required