Financial history FRADDON MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1078323
Charity reporting is overdue by 1337 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017
Total gross income £0 £4.40k £2.20k £2.20k £2.70k
Total expenditure £1.49k £2.60k £1.45k £1.82k £3.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A