THE OLD SILHILLIANS TRUST

Charity number: 1078706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £24.17k £15.58k £13.34k £17.69k £16.46k
Total expenditure £12.94k £12.75k £16.37k £22.86k £20.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A