FRIENDS OF PRIORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1079484
Charity reporting is overdue by 764 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £4.83k £1.69k £8.28k £6.13k £3.69k
Total expenditure £4.34k £1.65k £7.10k £6.20k £3.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A