Trustees THE JOHN PHILLIPS MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1078840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LANCELOT REGINALD VICK Chair 01 October 1997
TETBURY WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time
ROMNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DAVID NORRIS Trustee 09 May 2017
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time
ROMNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Richard Arthur Cooper Trustee 14 February 2017
ROMNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MICHAEL JOHN HOUGHTON Trustee 14 October 2003
TETBURY WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time
ROMNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WILLIAM COOK Trustee 13 November 2000
TETBURY WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time
ROMNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOHN ALEXANDRE HUGGINSON Trustee 19 October 2000
TETBURY WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time
ROMNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DAVID JOHN HICKS Trustee 01 July 1999
TETBURY WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time
ROMNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time