KINGS NYMPTON PARISH HALL

Charity number: 1113721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Chisholm Trustee 04 June 2018 None on record
NICKY STOCK Trustee None on record
CAROLINE SAVAGE Trustee None on record
CLARE TURNER Chair 05 February 2012 None on record
DEREK WEAVER ATKINSON Trustee 01 February 2014 None on record
Sophia Williams-Pottinger Trustee 05 June 2017 None on record
Mike Short Trustee 22 April 2013 None on record